Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 388 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6197 Week
» 13381 Month
» 321362 Year
» 1205743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C133 m/e 06/1946
BR 34033 8w/e 08/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1946 CHARD

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Scrapping During 05/1966
Service Life 19 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/06/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 06/10/1951
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC BTN Brighton 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 10/06/1950
LOAN 73A Stewarts Lane 12/05/1951
LOAN 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 05/09/1951
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C133
Built at Brighton Works
   
07/1946 Naming Named 'CHARD'    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34033    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34033    

prev prev