Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C134 m/e 07/1946
BR 34034 9w/e 01/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1946 HONITON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed07/1946
Rebuilt08/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/07/1967
Scrapping During 04/1968
Service Life 21 yrs , 2 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Aug 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 09/09/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 07/10/1950
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 08/12/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/03/1952
71A Eastleigh m/e 09/11/1961
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 02/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/10/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 09/11/1961
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
WDN   w/e 02/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C134, name: HONITON
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34034    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34034    

prev prev