Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 152 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 152 Week
» 18934 Month
» 267227 Year
» 1151608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C135 m/e 07/1946
BR 34035 5w/e 12/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1946 SHAFTESBURY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1946
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 01/06/1963
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 16 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 17/06/1950
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 09/09/1950
75A Brighton 4w/e 07/10/1950
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 08/12/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 14/01/1958
   Withdrawn 4w/e 01/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC BTN Brighton 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 31/10/1950
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 14/01/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 04/05/1963
WDN   4w/e 01/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C135, name: SHAFTESBURY
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34035    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
14/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 34035    

prev prev