29/02/1948 |
Brighton Works |
No. 21C149 is in shops for conversion to 'B.B.' Class. Nos. S79203 and S1178 are painted in black livery; the latter has the number on the bunker, still, in spite of its diminutive size. The oil-burner S21C136 left shops on 20/2. 'Schools' S938 has now left, but 903 an 906 are in shops under repair. Metal sheeting is now being added to the lower half of the boiler of the 'West Country' class in addition to the air-smoothed casing. This is believed to be an attempt to avoid the oil-bath catching fire and damaging the asbestos clothing, etc |
SLS/194804 |
10/10/1948 |
Eastleigh MPD (shed dump) |
The following were on Eastleigh shed dump:-Nos. 3, 90, 176, 135/9, 143/5, S335, 340/1, 271, 348/51, 636/46/57, 2001/06/07/10, 2044, 2598/99, 2604/09, 700S. It is understood that some of these are likely to be removed to Dinton in the near future. It is possible that No. 348 is also to be withdrawn, in which case she will be the first 'G.6' to go the way of the other Adams' classes. The following were stored out of service on the shed dump:-(a) Coal-burning: No. 30707; (b) Oil-burning: Nos. 148/55, 411/63, 713, 30286. No. 34019 has been re-converted from oil-burning to coal-burning and No. 34036 (although oil-burning on 10/10), is to be similarly dealt with in the near future; a start is being made on re-converting the 'King Arthur's.' The following are ex Works, painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 30039 ('M.7'), 30231 ('0.2'), 30428 ('L.12'), 30442 ('L.11'), 30923 Bradfield and 32043 ('B.4X'). The top of the cab sides and the splashers are not lined out, thus spoiling what is otherwise quite a pleasing effect. No. 30244 ('M.7') is an additional appearance in green-fully lined. No. 32043 is now fitted with Ross Pop safety valves. New 'Merchant Navy' No. 35022 was on Eastleigh shed on 10/10. |
SLS/194811 |
30/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks. B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted. |
SLS/195008 |
30/11/1950 |
General |
With the withdrawal of D.1m No. 2252 (Buckhurst, Neilson 2721, 12/81) none of this famous Stroudley 0-4-2T type remains in regular service, though 2359(D.1) is still on the register. No. 34036 has come out of Brighton Works in malachite green (re-touched) with emblem on tender, but still nameless. |
SLS/195012 |
07/09/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. |
SLS/196310 |