Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C137 m/e 08/1946
BR 34037 7w/e 03/05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/1946 CLOVELLY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed08/1946
Rebuilt03/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 08/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 12/05/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 14/01/1958
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 24/02/1958
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959
71B Bournemouth m/e 10/02/1961
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 15/05/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 5w/e 13/11/1948
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 14/01/1958
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 15/05/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C137, name: CLOVELLY
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34037    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
14/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
15/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34037    
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev