Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C140 m/e 09/1946
BR 34040 5w/e 13/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1946 CREWKERNE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed09/1946
Rebuilt10/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/07/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 12/05/1951
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 9w/e 30/06/1952
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 06/11/1954
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 15/06/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 02/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 5w/e 13/11/1948
REINS 75A Brighton 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 9w/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 02/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C140, name: CREWKERNE
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34040    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34040    
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev