16/06/1951 |
Brighton Works |
On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. |
SLS/195108 |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Kingmoor MPD |
In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. |
SLS/196304 |
11/04/1963 |
Derby Works |
Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. |
SLS/196304 |
27/04/1963 |
Birmingham Excursions |
On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. |
SLS/196304 |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |