Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C141 m/e 09/1946
BR 34041 5w/e 12/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1946 WILTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/01/1966
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Oct 1959

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 12/05/1951
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 06/11/1954
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 15/06/1956
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 23/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW EXJ Exmouth Junction m/e 31/10/1946
ALLOC BTN Brighton 5w/e 04/02/1950
REINS 75A Brighton 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 9w/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 23/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C141
Built at Brighton Works
   
10/1946 Naming Named 'WILTON'    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34041    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34041    

prev prev