Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 525 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 21214 Month
» 269507 Year
» 1153888 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C142 m/e 10/1946
BR 34042 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1946 DORCHESTER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed10/1946
Rebuilt01/1959
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966
Service Life 19 yrs , 3 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Jan 1959

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 12/05/1951
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 06/11/1954
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 15/06/1956
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 9w/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C142, name: DORCHESTER
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34042    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34042    

prev prev