Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C143 m/e 10/1946
BR 34043 4w/e 06/10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1946 COOMBE MARTIN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1946
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 29/06/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 16 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys
Information First of class withdrawn

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 12/05/1951
71B Bournemouth 9w/e 30/06/1952
   Withdrawn 4w/e 29/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 71B Bournemouth w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/05/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C143, name: COOMBE MARTIN
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34043    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 34043    

prev prev