Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C146 m/e 11/1946
BR 34046 5w/e 12/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1946 BRAUNTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed11/1946
Rebuilt02/1959
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 10/10/1965
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951
75A Brighton 7w/e 27/06/1951
71B Bournemouth w/e 11/03/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 10/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE 75A Brighton 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 75A Brighton 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 11/03/1959
WDN   w/e 10/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C146, name: BRAUNTON
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34046    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34046    

prev prev