Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 149 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 149 Week
» 14406 Month
» 242290 Year
» 1463855 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C147 m/e 11/1946
BR 34047 5w/e 12/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1946 CALLINGTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed11/1946
Rebuilt10/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/06/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Nov 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1946
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951
75A Brighton 7w/e 27/06/1951
70A Nine Elms 3w/e 13/10/1958
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 25/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 9w/e 01/03/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 25/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Shed (Waiting Works or Scrap) Ex Works: D2283, 34079, 75005, 82019. Waiting Works or Scrap: 30029, 30036, 30048, 30052/3, 30102/7/8, 30480, 30512, 30546/8, 30667, 30837, 31626/9, 31797, 31864/8, 32646, 32650, 32662, 34047, 34065/7, 34073, 76028. Interesting Locos: 70017 (5A) Failed, 75016 (5E), 4951 (81F). SLS/196407
31/05/1965 Steam Plentiful at Clapham Junction During 2½ hours at the 'busiest junction (combined) station in the world' then a subsequent 30 mins. or so at Waterloo on an ordinary weekday evening covering the peak period at the end of May, and as then normal-though some of the Pacifics were not exactly as rostered-I noted 10 rebuilt light Pacifics on express and main line trains : Nos. 34008/13/32/47/8/56/77/85/7/101; 34077/87 had no visible name plates when passing through. Several were on 'Merchant Navy' turns including the Bournemouth 2-hr. up service due in at 4.40, about 12 mins. late; and the heavy, fast-timed 6.30 p.m. down. Only two of the large 4-6-2s: 35026/9 were seen respectively hauling the down 'Royal Wessex' and up 'Bournemouth Belle,' loaded to 11 Pullmans plus van, about 3 mins. late, signal-checked through Clapham Junction. Most were in a rather forlorn looking state externally. Of B.R. standard classes there were: 3 class 5, 4-6-0s; a class 4 2-6-0 on down freight towards Feltham; green class 3 2-6-2T No. 82006 (lately arrived from Machynlleth, Cambrian line) on two trips with the unadvertised Kensington Post Office passenger trains; two others, also two class 4 2-6-4Ts, were on Clapham Yard-Waterloo empty stock workings. The sole Southern Railway, Maunsell, engine was S15 4-6-0MT, 30838, waiting at Waterloo in evening. SLS/196507

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1946 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C147, name: CALLINGTON
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 34047    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
25/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34047    

prev prev