Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 728 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14134 Week
» 67150 Month
» 186677 Year
» 3213530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C148 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
34048 |
5w/e |
04/09/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
11/1946 |
CREDITON |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 13/03/1966 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Mar 1959 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 1 |
3298 |
30/11/1946 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3295 |
27/03/1954 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 2 |
3333 |
14/03/1959 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1959 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1965 |
Steam Plentiful at Clapham Junction |
During 2½ hours at the 'busiest junction (combined) station in the world' then a subsequent 30 mins. or so at Waterloo on an ordinary weekday evening covering the peak period at the end of May, and as then normal-though some of the Pacifics were not exactly as rostered-I noted 10 rebuilt light Pacifics on express and main line trains : Nos. 34008/13/32/47/8/56/77/85/7/101; 34077/87 had no visible name plates when passing through. Several were on 'Merchant Navy' turns including the Bournemouth 2-hr. up service due in at 4.40, about 12 mins. late; and the heavy, fast-timed 6.30 p.m. down. Only two of the large 4-6-2s: 35026/9 were seen respectively hauling the down 'Royal Wessex' and up 'Bournemouth Belle,' loaded to 11 Pullmans plus van, about 3 mins. late, signal-checked through Clapham Junction. Most were in a rather forlorn looking state externally. Of B.R. standard classes there were: 3 class 5, 4-6-0s; a class 4 2-6-0 on down freight towards Feltham; green class 3 2-6-2T No. 82006 (lately arrived from Machynlleth, Cambrian line) on two trips with the unadvertised Kensington Post Office passenger trains; two others, also two class 4 2-6-4Ts, were on Clapham Yard-Waterloo empty stock workings. The sole Southern Railway, Maunsell, engine was S15 4-6-0MT, 30838, waiting at Waterloo in evening. |
SLS/196507 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C148, name: CREDITON Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
30/11/1946 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3298 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34048 |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3295 |
|
|
03/1959 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3333 |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
13/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34048 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|