Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1015 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6613 Week
» 29119 Month
» 332309 Year
» 1553874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway 21C151 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 34051 5w/e 13/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1946 WINSTON CHURCHILL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1946
Withdrawal During 10/1965
Service Life 18 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1946
SAL Salisbury on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9E Nine Elms 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE 72B Salisbury 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 72B Salisbury w/e 13/06/1955
WDN   w/e 19/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/09/1947 Waterloo Station At an official ceremony held at Waterloo on 10/9 the following were named: 21C151 Winston Churchill, 21C152 Lord Dowding and 21C164 Fighter Command, while on 16/9 during a similar function these were also named: 21C154 Lord Beaverbrook, 21C165 Hurricane and 21C166 Spitfire. SLS/194710
30/09/1947 Brighton Works Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. SLS/194710
31/01/1951 Eastleigh Works ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. SLS/195103
25/10/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). SLS/195112
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1946 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C151, name: WINSTON CHURCHILL
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34051    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34051    

prev prev