Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 717 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 20446 Month
» 268739 Year
» 1153120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C152 m/e 12/1946
BR 34052 4w/e 12/03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1946 LORD DOWDING

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed12/1946
Rebuilt09/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 02/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Sep 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9E Nine Elms 5w/e 04/02/1950
REINS 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 8w/e 27/06/1951
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C152, name: LORD DOWDING
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34052    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34052    
02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev