Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 657 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 32131 Month
» 66773 Year
» 1288338 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C154 m/e 01/1947
BR 34054 7w/e 03/05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1947 LORD BEAVERBROOK

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 01/1947
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
72B Salisbury 9w/e 30/06/1952
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 9E Nine Elms 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE 72B Salisbury 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 72B Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/11/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C154
Built at Brighton Works
   
02/1947 Naming Named 'LORD BEAVERBROOK'    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34054    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34054    

prev prev