Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C155 m/e 02/1947
BR 34055 5w/e 31/07/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1947 FIGHTER PILOT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 02/1947
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Scrapping During 05/1964
Service Life 16 yrs , 7 mths
Information First unrebuilt Battle of Britain to be withdrawn

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
72B Salisbury 9w/e 30/06/1952
75A Brighton 4w/e 10/03/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 2w/e 12/08/1949
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 6w/e 26/09/1949
ALLOC 9E Nine Elms 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/05/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C155, name: FIGHTER PILOT
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34055    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
08/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Open Day: Open Day - Open day exhibit RO 9/1954 Link
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 34055    

prev prev