Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C157 m/e 03/1947
BR 34057   25/06/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1947 BIGGIN HILL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 03/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/05/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys
Information Last unrebuilt Battle of Britain withdrawn

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DOV Dover Marine 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951
91S To Southern Region 4w/e 19/04/1952
72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952
72B Salisbury 4w/e 06/11/1954
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/12/1954
75A Brighton 4w/e 24/11/1960
70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 07/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine P 01/12/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 9E Nine Elms 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
LOAN 30A Stratford w/e 19/05/1951
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 6w/e 05/09/1951
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 9w/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 07/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C157, name: BIGGIN HILL
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover (DOV)    
25/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 34057    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34057    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev