Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 265 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2172 Week
» 20954 Month
» 269247 Year
» 1153628 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C159 m/e 04/1947
BR 34059 7w/e 03/05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1947 SIR ARCHIBALD SINCLAIR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed04/1947
Rebuilt03/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sun 29/05/1966
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
72B Salisbury 4w/e 10/10/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 29/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 3w/e 10/10/1955
WDN   w/e 29/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C159, name: SIR ARCHIBALD SINCLAIR
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34059    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34059    

prev prev