Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2085 Week
» 9269 Month
» 317250 Year
» 1201631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C160 m/e 04/1947
BR 34060 4w/e 06/10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1947 25 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed04/1947
Rebuilt11/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1947
Withdrawal During 06/1967
Scrapping During 05/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs , 2 mths
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Nov 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms m/e 11/11/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/11/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C160, name: 25 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34060    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34060    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev