Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 695 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 9034 Week
» 6142 Month
» 113088 Year
» 1334653 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C161 m/e 04/1947
BR 34061 y/e 1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1947 73 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sun 16/08/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951
73H Dover Marine 4w/e 24/11/1960
73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
71A Eastleigh m/e 09/11/1961
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 02/11/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 20/07/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 16/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 09/11/1961
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/11/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 20/07/1964
WDN   w/e 16/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C161
Built at Brighton Works
   
05/1947 Naming Named '73 SQUADRON'    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34061    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (73H)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34061    

prev prev