Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 733 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 9072 Week
» 6180 Month
» 113126 Year
» 1334691 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C162 m/e 05/1947
BR 34062 y/e 1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1947 17 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed05/1947
Rebuilt04/1959
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1947
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Scrapping During 06/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Mar 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 30/05/1947
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 22/04/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C162, name: 17 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34062    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34062    
07/05/1966 Sightings Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped RO 8/1966 Link

prev prev