Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C163 m/e 05/1947
BR 34063 5w/e 12/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1947 229 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sun 15/08/1965
Scrapping During 05/1966
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys
Information Name affixed Jan-1949

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 11/03/1959
75A Brighton 4w/e 27/05/1963
70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 15/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 29/05/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 22/04/1950
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 12/01/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 27/05/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 15/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C163
Built at Brighton Works
   
07/1947 Naming Named '229 SQUADRON'    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34063    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34063    
07/05/1966 Sightings Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped RO 8/1966 Link

prev prev