Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C164 m/e 07/1947
BR 34064 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1947 FIGHTER COMMAND

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sun 22/05/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 28/05/1962
70D Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964
70E Salisbury 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 22/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 14/07/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 22/04/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 28/05/1962
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 22/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C164, name: FIGHTER COMMAND
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34064    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34064    

prev prev