Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 633 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8972 Week
» 6080 Month
» 113026 Year
» 1334591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C166 m/e 09/1947
BR 34066 4w/e 12/03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1947 SPITFIRE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/09/1966
Scrapping During 01/1967
Service Life 19 yrs , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
70E Salisbury m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 04/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 4w/e 26/09/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 12/12/1949
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 04/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C166, name: SPITFIRE
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34066    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34066    

prev prev