10/09/1947 |
Waterloo Station |
At an official ceremony held at Waterloo on 10/9 the following were named: 21C151 Winston Churchill, 21C152 Lord Dowding and 21C164 Fighter Command, while on 16/9 during a similar function these were also named: 21C154 Lord Beaverbrook, 21C165 Hurricane and 21C166 Spitfire. |
SLS/194710 |
30/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. |
SLS/194710 |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh Works (Waiting works) |
On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. |
SLS/195912 |
18/02/1962 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. |
SLS/196204 |
25/02/1962 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. |
SLS/196204 |