Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C168 m/e 10/1947
BR 34068 5w/e 13/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1947 KENLEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1947
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 16 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate P 01/12/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C168, name: KENLEY
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34068    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 34068    

prev prev