Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C169 m/e 10/1947
BR 34069 9w/e 01/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1947 HAWKINGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1947
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 30/11/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 16 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/03/1954
   Withdrawn 4w/e 30/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate P 01/12/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 19/03/1954
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C169, name: HAWKINGE
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34069    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
19/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 34069    

prev prev