Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C170   11/1947
BR 34070 7w/e 03/05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1947 MANSTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1947
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Service Life 16 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C Dover Marine 6w/e 21/06/1955
73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate P 01/12/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 12/12/1949
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 22/06/1954
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/02/1955
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1947 To Service To service as SR Number 21C170, name: MANSTON
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34070    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
16/07/1954 Sightings Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34070    

prev