|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1963 | Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) | Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34071 | ||
17/04/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3321 | ||
12/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
21/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
05/1960 | Modification | Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... | ||
17/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
14/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
30/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34071 | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |