Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3125 Week
» 14696 Month
» 262989 Year
» 1147370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34073 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1948 249 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 28/06/1964
Service Life 16 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
70D Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 28/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 28/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34073, name: 249 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34073    

prev prev