31/05/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. |
SLS/194807 |
06/05/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. |
SLS/195006 |
10/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
On the occasion of the Works visit on Saturday, 10th June, the following were noted: e20001 (new livery), 31295 (lined), 31706, 32460, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34074, 34082 615 Squadron (30)272, 32636 (lined, waiting boiler), 42096 (tanks being fitted), 42097 (boiler in), frames up to 42102, frames of 34110, 77108/90570 (V.F.4924/43), 77359/90207, 90702, 77030/90127, and the works shunters 377S an 2235. Diesel 15203 was still outside after repair and repaint. The transfer of the 'W.D. 8F' proceeds apace; they were most useful on the Southern Region for maintaining quick goods working between the frequent passenger services (mostly electric), as they had a good turn of speed;, and they were used on empty stock and mixed trains. |
SLS/195007 |
30/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks. B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted. |
SLS/195008 |
11/09/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) |
Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. |
SLS/196310 |