Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 591 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8930 Week
» 6038 Month
» 112984 Year
» 1334549 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34075 m/e 06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1948 264 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1948
Withdrawal 2w/e Mon 13/04/1964
Scrapping During 06/1965
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 09/09/1950
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 07/10/1950
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951
74B Ramsgate 9w/e 30/06/1952
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 08/10/1957
   Withdrawn 2w/e 13/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 31/10/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 08/10/1957
WDN   2w/e 13/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34075, name: 264 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34075    
07/05/1966 Sightings Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped RO 8/1966 Link

prev prev