Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34076 m/e 06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1948 41 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/01/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 17 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 12/05/1951
74B Ramsgate 9w/e 30/06/1952
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 08/10/1957
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
70E Salisbury 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/08/1948
LOAN 30A Stratford w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 09/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34076, name: 41 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34076    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev