Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34077 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1948 603 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed07/1948
Rebuilt07/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/03/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 18 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Jul 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/01/1958
70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
70B Feltham m/e 14/09/1964
70D Eastleigh w/e 20/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 26/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate 6w/e 12/12/1949
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane q/e 14/01/1958
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 20/11/1964
WDN   w/e 26/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34077, name: 603 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
14/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34077    
08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev