Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 148 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5241 Week
» 7823 Month
» 272456 Year
» 1494021 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34078 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1948 222 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1948
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 16 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys
Information Name affixed Dec-1948

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1948
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 01/08/1948
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms P 14/06/1959
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/07/1948 Brighton Works Locomotives under repair here (early July) included Nos. 919, 2129, S2301, 2415/77, 2547, 2644, 32576, W.D. 77101, while Nos. 34078-85 were in various stages of construction. SLS/194808
31/07/1948 Brighton Works New 'Pacifics' Nos. 34078-79 were on trial at the end of July, while Nos. 34080-81 were nearing completion SLS/194809
05/03/1961 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 34078, name: 222 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34078    

prev prev