Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 430 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6406 Week
» 12540 Month
» 240424 Year
» 1461989 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34079 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1948 141 SQUADRON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 17 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/02/1958
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 01/08/1948
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/07/1948 Brighton Works Locomotives under repair here (early July) included Nos. 919, 2129, S2301, 2415/77, 2547, 2644, 32576, W.D. 77101, while Nos. 34078-85 were in various stages of construction. SLS/194808
31/07/1948 Brighton Works New 'Pacifics' Nos. 34078-79 were on trial at the end of July, while Nos. 34080-81 were nearing completion SLS/194809
28/04/1951 Eastleigh Works Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. SLS/195106
12/05/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. SLS/195107
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Shed (Ex Works) Ex Works: D2283, 34079, 75005, 82019. Waiting Works or Scrap: 30029, 30036, 30048, 30052/3, 30102/7/8, 30480, 30512, 30546/8, 30667, 30837, 31626/9, 31797, 31864/8, 32646, 32650, 32662, 34047, 34065/7, 34073, 76028. Interesting Locos: 70017 (5A) Failed, 75016 (5E), 4951 (81F). SLS/196407
14/09/1964 Southern engines for storage 34015/9/33/42/77/9, 35005/10/2/22, 73083/7, 76019 are to be stored after transfer, (In view of large scale moves to a few sheds only, the usual arrangement for such transfers has not been used this time. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 34079, name: 141 SQUADRON
Built at Brighton Works
   
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34079    

prev prev