Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34081 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 16/08/1964
Service Life 15 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 08/10/1957
70D Eastleigh m/e 20/07/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 16/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 5w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 20/07/1964
WDN   w/e 16/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34081
Built at Brighton Works
   
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34081    

prev prev