Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34082 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed09/1948
Rebuilt04/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 24/04/1966
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 17 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Apr 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/01/1958
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 22/03/1958
70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 24/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane q/e 14/01/1958
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 10/04/1958
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 24/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34082
Built at Brighton Works
   
14/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34082    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev