Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 420 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3563 Week
» 13733 Month
» 291529 Year
» 1175910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34083 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1948
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Scrapping During 06/1965
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 12/05/1951
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 24/02/1958
73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/11/1961
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34083
Built at Brighton Works
   
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34083    

prev prev