Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 523 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2430 Week
» 21212 Month
» 269505 Year
» 1153886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34084 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Scrapping During 03/1966
Service Life 16 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys
Information Fell down embankment at hither Green in shunting mishap Feb-1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 12/05/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 24/02/1958
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 22/03/1958
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 27/05/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 02/11/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 10/04/1958
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 24/11/1960
TOSTORE   4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 27/05/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/11/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34084
Built at Brighton Works
   
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34084    

prev prev