Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 48 Today
» 1367 Yesterday
» 6582 Week
» 6582 Month
» 195717 Year
» 1417282 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34085 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed11/1948
Rebuilt06/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/09/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966
Service Life 16 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Jun 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1948
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 12/05/1951
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 24/02/1958
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/03/1958
71B Bournemouth 8w/e 17/01/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BAT Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 10/04/1958
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 17/01/1961
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/11/1948 Brighton Works In shops for repair: Nos, 32501 an 77359 (ready); 31919 an 32501 (nearly ready); 680S; CC1 (to be 20001); 1899, 2339, 2512, 2563, 32523, 77256; 34064 (lighter green livery). New construction Nos. 34085-90; 36001; boilers and tenders for 'Merchant Navy' Class. SLS/194812
31/05/1965 Steam Plentiful at Clapham Junction During 2½ hours at the 'busiest junction (combined) station in the world' then a subsequent 30 mins. or so at Waterloo on an ordinary weekday evening covering the peak period at the end of May, and as then normal-though some of the Pacifics were not exactly as rostered-I noted 10 rebuilt light Pacifics on express and main line trains : Nos. 34008/13/32/47/8/56/77/85/7/101; 34077/87 had no visible name plates when passing through. Several were on 'Merchant Navy' turns including the Bournemouth 2-hr. up service due in at 4.40, about 12 mins. late; and the heavy, fast-timed 6.30 p.m. down. Only two of the large 4-6-2s: 35026/9 were seen respectively hauling the down 'Royal Wessex' and up 'Bournemouth Belle,' loaded to 11 Pullmans plus van, about 3 mins. late, signal-checked through Clapham Junction. Most were in a rather forlorn looking state externally. Of B.R. standard classes there were: 3 class 5, 4-6-0s; a class 4 2-6-0 on down freight towards Feltham; green class 3 2-6-2T No. 82006 (lately arrived from Machynlleth, Cambrian line) on two trips with the unadvertised Kensington Post Office passenger trains; two others, also two class 4 2-6-4Ts, were on Clapham Yard-Waterloo empty stock workings. The sole Southern Railway, Maunsell, engine was S15 4-6-0MT, 30838, waiting at Waterloo in evening. SLS/196507


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 34085
Built at Brighton Works
   
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
26/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34085    

prev prev