Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1354 Today
» 1394 Yesterday
» 6521 Week
» 6521 Month
» 195656 Year
» 1417221 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34086 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/06/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966
Service Life 17 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 08/10/1957
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 24/02/1958
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/03/1958
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 19/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 8w/e 08/01/1949
TOSTORE 74B Ramsgate 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 10/04/1958
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 19/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Brighton Works Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 34056/64, both new green and lined (done at Eastleigh, in the summer), 20001 (ex CC1 to-day), 34088-90 (under construction), 36001 ('Leader'), 2325/39 an 32512 (ready). No. 34086, which ran trials at the end of November, is painted in the new light green and fully lined but not the panels, while the bottom of the engine and tender casing are all green and not black; the first one to be done here in this livery. SLS/194901
06/01/1960 Eastleigh Works Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. SLS/196002


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 34086
Built at Brighton Works
   
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
19/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34086    

prev prev