Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 277 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2184 Week
» 20966 Month
» 269259 Year
» 1153640 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34088 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed12/1948
Rebuilt04/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/03/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Apr 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
75A Brighton 4w/e 24/06/1963
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 22/07/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 8w/e 08/01/1949
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 9w/e 31/10/1954
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 13/06/1955
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 24/06/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 19/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 34088
Built at Brighton Works
   
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
24/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34088    
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev