Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34091 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1949
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 15 yrs , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72B Salisbury 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 20/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 26/09/1949
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 22/06/1954
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 20/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 34091
Built at Brighton Works
   
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34091    

prev prev