Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34095 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed10/1949
Rebuilt01/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 10/1949 to Ramsgate (RAM)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 04/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 17 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Jan 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate (New) m/e 10/1949
BM Bournemouth m/e 10/1949
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 27/01/1956
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BM Bournemouth 4w/e 29/10/1949
ALLOC BM Bournemouth 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 29/01/1956
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM)    
10/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 34095
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Ramsgate (RAM)
   
27/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34095    
04/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev