Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1325 Today
» 1394 Yesterday
» 6492 Week
» 6492 Month
» 195627 Year
» 1417192 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34096 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed11/1949
Rebuilt04/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1949 to Ramsgate (RAM)
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Apr 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate (New) m/e 11/1949
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 14/01/1958
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/11/1949 Brighton Works On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . SLS/194912
31/03/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. SLS/195108
05/03/1961 Eastleigh Works Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. SLS/196104
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 34096
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Ramsgate (RAM)
   
14/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34096    

prev prev