Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34098 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed12/1949
Rebuilt02/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1949 to Ramsgate (RAM)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/06/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate (New) m/e 12/1949
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 24/02/1958
75A Brighton w/e 11/03/1959
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 28/05/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 25/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW RAM Ramsgate 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 11/03/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 28/05/1962
WDN   w/e 25/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 34098
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Ramsgate (RAM)
   
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34098    

prev prev