Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 152 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 152 Week
» 18934 Month
» 267227 Year
» 1151608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34101 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed02/1950
Rebuilt09/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 02/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/07/1966
Service Life 16 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961
75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 24/06/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 17/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/03/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 22/06/1954
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 24/06/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 17/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 34101
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
24/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34101    

prev prev