Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 188 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 188 Week
» 18970 Month
» 267263 Year
» 1151644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34103 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 02/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/09/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966
Service Life 15 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine 3w/e 17/11/1956
71B Bournemouth 8w/e 17/01/1961
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/03/1950
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 34103
Built at Brighton Works
   
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962 Link
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34103    

prev prev